California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2129 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2024

Amended

Bill July 3, 2024
Bill April 11, 2024