|
09/22/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 381, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5362.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|