Assembly | 05/16/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2024 | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2024 | Read first time. To print. |