LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2145
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2145
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2023-2024 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2145
Action History
Assembly
05/16/2024
In committee: Held under submission.
Assembly
04/24/2024
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Assembly
03/19/2024
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Assembly
02/20/2024
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
Assembly
02/07/2024
From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
Assembly
02/06/2024
Read first time. To print.