California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2149 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2024

Amended

Bill July 3, 2024
Bill June 24, 2024
Bill May 16, 2024
Bill April 17, 2024
Bill April 8, 2024