|
09/29/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 952, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2024
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|