Senate | 06/05/2024 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2024 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5624.) | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 16). | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | Referred to Com. on U. & E. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2024 | Read first time. To print. |