California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2174 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2024

Amended

Bill June 18, 2024
Bill April 24, 2024
Bill February 27, 2024