|
07/02/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 61, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2024
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4491.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4997.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|