California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2181 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2024

Amended

Bill June 6, 2024
Bill April 8, 2024
Bill April 1, 2024