California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2192 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2024

Amended

Bill August 23, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024