California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2193 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2024

Amended

Bill August 15, 2024
Bill July 3, 2024
Bill May 16, 2024
Bill April 25, 2024