California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2198 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2024

Amended

Bill August 19, 2024
Bill June 17, 2024
Bill June 3, 2024
Bill April 29, 2024