|
09/19/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 271, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 5159.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2024
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|