Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2625.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5215.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on A., E., S., & T.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A., E., S., & T. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on A., E., S., & T. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|