Assembly | 05/16/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2024 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2024 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2024 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2024 | Read first time. To print. |