|
09/29/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 954, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4744.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2024
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2024
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|