Assembly | 04/29/2024 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2024 | Read first time. To print. |