Senate | 08/15/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/05/2024 | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 11. Page 5364.) | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 16). | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2024 | Read first time. To print. |