California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2236 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2024

Amended

Bill August 20, 2024
Bill July 3, 2024
Bill June 20, 2024
Bill May 16, 2024
Bill March 21, 2024