|
09/19/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 272, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 29)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HOUSING pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2024
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/29/2024
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|