California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2250 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2024

Amended

Bill August 27, 2024
Bill August 23, 2024
Bill August 15, 2024
Bill June 6, 2024