Senate | 07/03/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 1. Page 5436.) | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16). | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5215.) | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2024 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2024 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2024 | Read first time. To print. |