Assembly | 05/16/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2024 | Read first time. To print. |