California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2257 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2024

Amended

Bill August 5, 2024
Bill June 20, 2024
Bill April 23, 2024
Bill March 20, 2024