California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB226 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2023

Amended

Bill September 1, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023