Senate | 05/22/2024 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 5154.) | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2024 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1). | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 3). | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2024 | Read first time. To print. |