|
06/14/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 15, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2024
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5848.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4355.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4744.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|