California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2279 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2024

Amended

Bill August 15, 2024
Bill June 3, 2024
Bill April 4, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024