Senate | 08/15/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2024 | In committee: Referred to suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | Referred to Com. on PUB S. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5434.) | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16). | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2024 | Read first time. To print. |