Assembly | 05/23/2023 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2023 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2023 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2023 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2023 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2023 | Read first time. To print. |