|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 421, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3230.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3228.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2557.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1707.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|