Assembly | 04/11/2024 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2024 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2024 | Read first time. To print. |