|
09/27/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 711, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 13. Page 5666.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5437.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|