California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2309 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2024

Amended

Bill July 3, 2024
Bill June 19, 2024
Bill May 9, 2024
Bill April 17, 2024