California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2319 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2024

Amended

Bill August 15, 2024
Bill June 27, 2024
Bill May 20, 2024
Bill May 16, 2024
Bill March 21, 2024