Assembly | 05/16/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2024 | Read first time. To print. |