California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2326 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2024

Amended

Bill August 15, 2024
Bill June 3, 2024
Bill April 18, 2024
Bill March 21, 2024