Assembly | 05/16/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2024 | (Pending re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES.) | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2024 | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2024 | Read first time. To print. |