California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2343 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2024

Amended

Bill August 19, 2024
Bill June 6, 2024