|
09/24/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 512, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 16.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 9.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 12. Page 5667.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5348.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|