Assembly | 05/16/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5215.) | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | Referred to Com. on C. & C. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2024 | Read first time. To print. |