California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2375 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2024

Amended

Bill June 26, 2024
Bill May 20, 2024
Bill April 9, 2024