California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2376 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2024

Amended

Bill August 23, 2024
Bill July 3, 2024
Bill March 21, 2024