California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2378 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2024

Amended

Bill May 29, 2024
Bill May 21, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024