Senate | 08/15/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2024 | In committee: Referred to suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 5568.) | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (May 16). | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2024 | Read first time. To print. |