Assembly
|
02/01/2024
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2024
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/06/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/05/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|