|
10/10/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 641, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2357.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1178.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|