California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2422 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2024

Amended

Bill May 21, 2024
Bill March 20, 2024
Bill February 26, 2024