|
09/27/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 651, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5601.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|